Ias officer list karnataka
Webb24 feb. 2024 · Karnataka govt yesterday transferred 7 IPS officers. Kuldeep Kumar R Jain, a 2011-batch IPS officer, who was posted as Traffic West Division, Bengaluru, replaced N Shashi Kumar as CP, Mangaluru with immediate effect. Similarly, Dekka Kishore Babu, 2013-batch IPS, SP wireless Bengaluru was transferred and posted as SP, Intelligence. Webb3 apr. 2024 · IAS Toppers and Their Home States. The list below mentions the names of the UPSC Toppers list along with their home states, from 2014 to 2024: UPSC 2024 ...
Ias officer list karnataka
Did you know?
WebbIAS trainee of 2024 Batch who have joined 96 th Foundation Course at LBSNAA. Select Cadre. The draft Civil List has been updated by the respective State Cadre. Additions / … http://gad.mp.gov.in/IASlist.pdf
WebbD.K. Ravi was an officer of Karnataka cadre. He was an IAS officer of 2009 batch. When he was posted as District Collector in Kolar Distt. of Karnataka, he launched a crackdown on many illegal sand mining projects being carried out. After which he was transferred and given charge of Additional Commissioner of Commercial Taxes. WebbFör 1 dag sedan · IAS officer Akash Shankar, working as chief executive officer of Kodagu zilla panchayat at present, ... Karnataka: IAS officer, kin booked for dowry …
Webb162 rader · 7 mars 2024 · Karnataka : D-01, Kidwai Nagar : … WebbFör 1 dag sedan · BENGALURU: IAS officer Akash Shankar, working as chief executive officer of Kodagu zilla panchayat at present, his parents and brother have been booked …
WebbPolitical Science Course Duration and Fees. Undergraduate or B.A (Hons.) in Political Science is a three-year programme. After completing graduation you can go for further …
Webb1 jan. 2024 · Karnataka 51 Years: 33: Shri K N Ramesh Id No. 815023 23/02/2024;SCS: 15/05/1970 2012;KN Karnataka 51 Years: Main Menu Search Menu Appendices Menu ... csd diesellokomotivenWebb17 mars 2015 · Indian Administrative Service (IAS) officer D K Ravi aka D K Ravikumar, who had taken over the land mafia in Karnataka’s Kolar district, allegedly committed suicide by hanging himself. As... csdcas application loginmarcel ortizWebb24 mars 2024 · Chief Executive Officer, ZP, Kolar: ceo_zp_klr[at]nic[dot]in: Zilla Panchayath office, Chickballapur road, Kolar: 08152-240649: Smt. Venkatalakshmi H S, K.A.S: ... Karnataka. Developed and hosted by National Informatics Centre, Ministry of Electronics & Information Technology, Government of India. csd.disa.mil loginWebb12 maj 2024 · Next on the list is Vivek Kulkarni, a 1979-batch IAS officer who quit the service in 2004 to kickstart his entrepreneurial journey after working in the government for 25 years. At the time, he was ... marcelo sacramoneWebb4 juni 2024 · Jessica Vanlalfaki. June 4, 2024. Who is Shilpa Nag: Karnataka IAS officer and Mysuru City Corporation Commissioner Shilpa Nag has handed in her resignation from the office due to alleged harassment from Deputy Commissioner, Rohini Sindhuri. “No district or city should have such an officer,” said Nag in a media conference. csd calendar clover scWebbKarnataka csd cabinets